Andreas Rogger
domiciled in Nenzlingen, from Eich Active mandates: Stiftung Hund Schweiz, Schweizerische Kynologische Gesellschaft SKG and more Connected persons: Heliane Canepa, Kurt Rohrbach, Walter Müllhaupt and more You can stay up to date through "Andreas Rogger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Rogger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andreas Rogger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Rogger"
|
Places where people with the name Andreas Rogger live
Sectors in which people with the name Andreas Rogger work
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Andreas Rogger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andreas Rogger
Publication number: HR02-1005145178, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stiftung Hund Schweiz, in Balsthal, CHE-247.059.674, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 17.12.2018, Publ. 1004522493).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rogger, Andreas, von Eich, in Nenzlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2127685, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schweizerische Kynologische Gesellschaft SKG, in Bern, CHE-107.811.661, Verein (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 07.09.2012, Publ. 6839176).
Haftung/Nachschusspflicht neu:
[Streichung des Eintrags aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.] [gestrichen: Haftung/Nachschusspflicht: Persönliche Haftung der Mitglieder ausgeschlossen.].Organisation neu: [Streichung der Organisation von Amtes wegen, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ammann, Verena, von Wallisellen und Küssnacht SZ, in Zollikofen, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rogger, Andreas, von Eich, in Nenzlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
CTM Treuhand AG (CHE-111.969.472), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: CTM Treuhand AG].
Publication number: 7125630, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Wellingtonia AG, in Basel, CH-270.3.005.527-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 30.03.2005, S. 6, Publ. 2768392).
Statutenänderung:
15.03.2013. Mit Erklärung vom 15.03.2013 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Elliker Treuhand AG, in Basel, Revisionsstelle;
Bernath, André, von Thayngen, in Allschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rogger, Andreas, von Eich, in Nenzlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Arlesheim].