Patrick Pletscher
domiciled in Hombrechtikon, from Stäfa Active mandates: soulTec AG, AGIBA IT Services AG and more Connected persons: René Richard Gebele, Mike Beni Schmid, René Pfister and more You can stay up to date through "Patrick Pletscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Patrick Pletscher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Patrick Pletscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Patrick Pletscher"
|
Places where people with the name Patrick Pletscher live
Sectors in which people with the name Patrick Pletscher work
IT services
Other social services
IT services
Other social services
Private persons with the name Patrick Pletscher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Patrick Pletscher
Publication number: HR02-1005418745, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
soulTec AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-286.962.460, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 07.10.2021, Publ. 1005306903). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung vom 01.10.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pletscher, Patrick, von Stäfa, in Hombrechtikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huber, Daniel, von Elgg, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Pfister, René, von Hinwil, in Buchs (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rogg, Patrik, von Diessenhofen, in Sirnach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BruWi Treuhand AG (CHE-112.747.098), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004979333, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
AGIBA IT Services AG, in Winterthur, CHE-107.500.669, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2016, S.0, Publ. 3001143). [Der Verzicht auf eine eingeschränkte Revision wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung vom 29.02.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pletscher, Patrick, von Stäfa, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Theiler, Alexander Georg, von Hasle (LU), in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wespi & Partner AG (CHE-192.663.338), in Wallisellen, Revisionsstelle;
Schneebeli, Manuela, von Pfyn, in Wiesendangen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3709981, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für gemeinnützige Zwecke der ehemaligen Sparkasse Stäfa, in Stäfa, CHE-102.045.379, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2014, Publ. 1833253).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egli, Marcel, von Wald (ZH), in Uster, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Pletscher, Patrick, von Stäfa, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.