Alexander Peters
domiciled in Baar, from Austria Active mandates: Commodity Club Switzerland, Peters Sonus Nobilis Connected persons: Peter Sigg, Zarja Peters You can stay up to date through "Alexander Peters", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alexander Peters"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Alexander Peters", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alexander Peters"
|
|
Alexander Peters
domiciled in Hamburg, from Germany Active mandates: Manufactum AG Connected persons: Günter Bauer, Kai-Uwe Steffan, Martin Frey You can stay up to date through "Alexander Peters", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alexander Peters"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Alexander Peters", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alexander Peters"
|
Places where people with the name Alexander Peters live
Sectors in which people with the name Alexander Peters work
Associations and federations
Other freelance work
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Associations and federations
Other freelance work
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Private persons with the name Alexander Peters
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Alexander Peters
Publication number: HR02-1006126885, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Commodity Club Switzerland, in Freienbach, CHE-172.038.226, Verein (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2018, Publ. 4114077).
Statutenänderung:
22.02.2024.
Sitz neu:
Lachen.
Domizil neu:
c/o Peter Sigg, Burgweg 19, 8853 Lachen SZ.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tobler, Alexander Tristan, genannt Alex, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Bern, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sigg, Peter, von Dörflingen, in Lachen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Freienbach];
Peters, Alexander, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Baar, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005880702, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
AOT Trading AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-102.020.439, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 14.08.2023, Publ. 1005815687).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peters, Alexander, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Watters, John Douglas, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
de Rauglaudre, Gabriel, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michalopoulos, Ioannis, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Oberengstringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pittara, Aikaterini, griechische Staatsangehörige, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005875047, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
AddMaris AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-152.605.866, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2022, Publ. 1005525947).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peters, Alexander, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Watters, John Douglas, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Plumbly, Joseph Harry, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vouliagmeni (GR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pittara, Aikaterini, griechische Staatsangehörige, in Baar, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.