Markus Niederer
domiciled in Müntschemier, from Lutzenberg Active mandates: Geotest AG Connected persons: Andreas Kunzmann, Emanuel Huber, Rachel Anna Riner and more You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
|
|
Markus Niederer
domiciled in Schneisingen, from Lutzenberg Active mandates: Gartenbau Lengnau GmbH, MN Holding GmbH Connected persons: Bianca Niederer, Bianca Niederer You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
|
|
Markus Niederer
domiciled in Frenkendorf, from Lutzenberg Active mandates: Hilfsfonds der Migros Basel Connected persons: Celia Ghezzi-Francey, Christian Hasler You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Markus Niederer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Niederer"
|
Places where people with the name Markus Niederer live
Sectors in which people with the name Markus Niederer work
Architectural and engineering activities
Gardening and landscaping
Operation of investment companies
Operation of an pension fund
Architectural and engineering activities
Gardening and landscaping
Operation of investment companies
Operation of an pension fund
Private persons with the name Markus Niederer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Markus Niederer
Publication number: HR02-1005889585, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Geotest AG, in Zollikofen, CHE-106.009.709, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2023, Publ. 1005794433).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederer, Markus, von Lutzenberg, in Müntschemier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005837855, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Monitron AG, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-188.747.819, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2023, Publ. 1005789723).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hayer, Jörg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lanzenneunforn (Herdern), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Niederer, Markus, von Lutzenberg, in Müntschemier, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Longridge, Dylan, von Malans, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Zweigniederlassung neu:
[gestrichen: Altdorf UR (CHE-474.020.026)].
Publication number: HR02-1005466169, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gartenbau Lengnau GmbH, in Lengnau (AG), CHE-114.345.115, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 14.11.2017, Publ. 3867787). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 10.03.2022 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hediger, Paul, von Reinach AG, in Lengnau AG, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Hediger-Braun, Iris, von Selma und Reinach AG, in Lengnau AG, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
UTA Treuhand AG Baden (CHE-108.032.553), in Baden, Revisionsstelle, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
MN Holding GmbH (CHE-364.330.387), in Schneisingen, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Niederer, Markus, von Lutzenberg, in Schneisingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Niederer, Bianca Margrit, von Würenlingen, in Schneisingen, mit Einzelunterschrift.