Robert Müdespacher
domiciled in Wald, from Hinwil Active mandates: Siloah Fellowship International Connected persons: Raoul Mazzoleni, Esra Immanuel Müdespacher, Josua Haller and more You can stay up to date through "Robert Müdespacher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Müdespacher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Robert Müdespacher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Müdespacher"
|
Places where people with the name Robert Müdespacher live
Sectors in which people with the name Robert Müdespacher work
Other social services
Other social services
Private persons with the name Robert Müdespacher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Robert Müdespacher
Publication number: 4347831, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Siloah Fellowship International, in Schübelbach, CHE-101.247.236, Verein (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 19.08.2016, Publ. 3011283).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vontobel, Mario, von Rüti ZH, in Bertschikon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müdespacher, Robert, von Hinwil, in Wald (ZH), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4028902, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Siloah Fellowship International, in Schübelbach, CH-020.6.000.246-1, Leistet humanitäre Hilfe und Entwicklungshilfe, Verein (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 25.11.1999, S. 8004).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müdespacher, Robert, von Hinwil, in Gibswil, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Isenring, Walter, von Winterthur, in Wald ZH, Mitglied und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 835888, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sennereigenossenschaft Hub-Wald, in Wald ZH, Bezweckt die bestmögliche Verwertung der in Hub und Umgebung produzierten Kuhmilch, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 15.06.1993, S. 3099).
Firma neu:
Sennereigenossenschaft Hub-Wald in Liquidation. Die Genossenschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 12.12.2002 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müdespacher, Robert, von Hinwil, in Wald ZH, Präsident und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Honegger, Gottfried, von Wald ZH, in Wald ZH, Mitglied und Kassier, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kunz, Alfred, von Wald ZH, in Wald ZH, Mitglied und Aktuar, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].