Silvana Marinkovic
domiciled in Luzern, from Ebikon Active mandates: MelbaLUX GmbH, ELSTAHL T&L GmbH Connected persons: Lukasz Andrzej Banaszczyk, Andrey Musin You can stay up to date through "Silvana Marinkovic", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvana Marinkovic"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Silvana Marinkovic", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvana Marinkovic"
|
Places where people with the name Silvana Marinkovic live
Sectors in which people with the name Silvana Marinkovic work
General structural engineering
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
General structural engineering
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Private persons with the name Silvana Marinkovic
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Silvana Marinkovic
Publication number: HR02-1005909685, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
MelbaLUX GmbH, bisher in Cham, CHE-375.672.662, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2023, Publ. 1005836093).
Statutenänderung:
05.12.2023.
Sitz neu:
Luzern.
Domizil neu:
c/o IBR International Business Relations Ltd.liab.Co., Haldenstrasse 57, 6006 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gheorghiu, Bogdan-Dumitru, rumänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dübendorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marinkovic, Silvana, von Ebikon, in Luzern, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005195492, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
IBR International Business Relations Ltd.liab.Co., in Luzern, CHE-109.309.622, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 21.12.2009, S.15, Publ. 5402934).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marinkovic, Zoran, von Ebikon, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Marinkovic, Silvana, von Ebikon, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marinkovic, Stefan, von Ebikon, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004727315, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ELSTAHL T&L GmbH, in Baar, CHE-114.104.273, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 24.06.2019, Publ. 1004658050).
Statutenänderung:
24.09.2019.
Sitz neu:
Zug.
Domizil neu:
c/o STAX AG, Bahnhofstrasse 21, 6300 Zug.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wirtz, Valérie, von Reinach (BL), in Hünenberg, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marinkovic, Silvana, von Ebikon, in Luzern, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].