Benjamin Lack
domiciled in Moutier, from Obergösgen Active mandates: ChaufferAuBois Sàrl en liquidation Connected persons: Sibylle Lack You can stay up to date through "Benjamin Lack", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Benjamin Lack"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Benjamin Lack", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Benjamin Lack"
|
Places where people with the name Benjamin Lack live
Sectors in which people with the name Benjamin Lack work
Architectural and engineering activities
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Benjamin Lack
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Benjamin Lack
Publication number: HR02-1005768973, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ChaufferAuBois Sàrl, à Moutier, CHE-152.166.921, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 250 du 23.12.2016, Publ. 3243299).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
ChaufferAuBois Sàrl en liquidation.
Autres adresses:
c/o BVConsult SA, Rue de Flore 5, 2503 Biel/Bienne. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée des associés du 05.06.2023.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Lack, Benjamin, de Obergösgen, à Moutier, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle];
Lack, Sibylle, de Obergösgen, à Moutier, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associée, avec signature individuelle];
BVConsult SA (CHE-412.528.209), à Biel/Bienne, liquidatrice.
Publication number: 4198391, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stûv Helvetica SA, à Moutier, CHE-106.575.647, société anonyme (No. FOSC 51 du 14.03.2016, Publ. 2720659).
Modification des statuts:
28.03.2018.
Nouveau siège:
Biel/Bienne.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o BVConsult SA, Rue de Flore 5, 2502 Biel/Bienne.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Lack, Benjamin, de Obergösgen, à Moutier, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bernasconi, Vincent, de Les Genevez (JU), à Nods, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3519549, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lack Cheminées SA, à Moutier, CHE-115.017.300, société anonyme (No. FOSC 207 du 25.10.2016, Publ. 3125361).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Lack, Benjamin, de Obergösgen, à Moutier, vice-président, avec signature individuelle;
Lack-Bonjour, Monique, de Obergösgen, à Moutier, administratrice, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Lab, Dimitri, de Les Bois, à Corcelles BE, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature individuelle].