Andreas Hans Krieg
domiciled in Stachen, from Matten bei Interlaken Active mandates: Bread & Fish Foundation, Schlossgarten Immobilien AG and more Connected persons: Elias M.E. Abuzuluf, Peter Würsch, Andrea Maria Heinrichsdorff-Volpp and more You can stay up to date through "Andreas Hans Krieg", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Hans Krieg"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andreas Hans Krieg", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Hans Krieg"
|
Places where people with the name Andreas Hans Krieg live
Sectors in which people with the name Andreas Hans Krieg work
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of investment companies
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading in consumer goods
Fund management
Trading with various goods
Fiduciary services
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of investment companies
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading in consumer goods
Fund management
Trading with various goods
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Andreas Hans Krieg
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andreas Hans Krieg
Publication number: HR02-1005825003, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Bread & Fish Foundation, in Davos, CHE-497.884.753, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 01.04.2022, Publ. 1005441025).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stenzel, Markus Karl Wolfgang, von Oberegg, in Teufen (AR), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krieg, Andreas Hans, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Arbon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Roggwil (TG)];
Abuzuluf, Elias M.E. , palästinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bethlehem (PS), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005794870, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
airdata GmbH, in Rorschach, CHE-105.485.450, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 26.01.2021, Publ. 1005083626).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Würsch, Peter, von Emmetten, in St. Gallen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krieg, Andreas Hans, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Stachen (Arbon), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 29'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Freidorf TG (Roggwil (TG)), mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 29'000.00];
Zasada, Iza, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Frasnacht (Arbon), mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005126192, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Investitions-, Beteiligungs- und Kontrollunternehmen AG, in Rorschach, CHE-366.174.069, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2017, S.0, Publ. 3817393).
Statutenänderung:
11.03.2021.
Aktien neu:
6'249 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 6'249 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krieg, Andreas, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Freidorf TG (Roggwil (TG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Stachen (Arbon)].