Richard Knüsel
domiciled in Rotkreuz, from Risch Active mandates: Ravulco AG, Strassengenossenschaft 'Obere Weidstrasse' and more Connected persons: Albino Bellini-von Wartburg, Pietro Ernesto Minelli jun., Anton Bachmann-Arnet Jun. and more You can stay up to date through "Richard Knüsel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Richard Knüsel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Richard Knüsel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Richard Knüsel"
|
Places where people with the name Richard Knüsel live
Sectors in which people with the name Richard Knüsel work
Operation of other financial institutions
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Religious, political or secular associations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Richard Knüsel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Richard Knüsel
Publication number: HR02-1005505159, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Rumalo Immo AG, in Risch, CHE-113.058.110, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 05.11.2019, Publ. 1004752538).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knüsel, Richard, von Risch, in Risch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schellenberg, Sibylle, von Risch, in Sins, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005482910, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
BR Bau und Finanz AG, in Risch, CHE-113.570.721, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 17.03.2022, Publ. 1005429164).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knüsel, Richard, von Risch, in Rotkreuz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knüsel, Stephan, von Risch, in Hergiswil (NW), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005356427, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Ravulco AG, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-102.963.890, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2016, Publ. 2971093). Mit Erklärung vom 29.11.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Refina Treuhand AG Horw (CHE-107.936.742), in Horw, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bellini-von Wartburg, Albino, von Zürich, in Risch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Knüsel, Richard, von Risch, in Risch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].