Lukas Jost
domiciled in Wohlen b. Bern, from Wynigen Active mandates: Jost's Sàrl en liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Lukas Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Jost"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lukas Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Jost"
|
|
Lukas Jost
domiciled in Zollikofen, from Madiswil Active mandates: jost metallbau ag Connected persons: Marc Jost, Willi Hansjürg Jost You can stay up to date through "Lukas Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Jost"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lukas Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Jost"
|
Places where people with the name Lukas Jost live
Sectors in which people with the name Lukas Jost work
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Production of metal goods
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Production of metal goods
Private persons with the name Lukas Jost
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lukas Jost
Publication number: HR02-1005924334, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
jost metallbau ag, in Zollikofen, CHE-113.583.422, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2019, Publ. 1004732376).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Lukas, von Madiswil, in Münchenbuchsee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zollikofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004732376, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
jost metallbau ag, in Zollikofen, CHE-113.583.422, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2016, Publ. 3209625).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Willi Hansjürg, von Madiswil, in Zollikofen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Jost, Lukas, von Madiswil, in Zollikofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jost, Marc, von Madiswil, in Belp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004683687, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Take Two Publicity AG, in Zürich, CHE-103.776.037, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 30.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2454667).
Firma neu:
Take Two Publicity AG in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
c/o Trevin AG Treuhand, Mühlebachstrasse 72, 8032 Zürich.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 16.07.2019 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jost, Gabrielle, von Melchnau, in Wetzikon ZH, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mächler-Jost, Annemarie Emma, von Vorderthal, in Wetzikon ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Lukas Friedrich, von Melchnau, in Illnau-Effretikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].