Dieter Jost
domiciled in Ligerz, from Wynigen Active mandates: Partofina AG Connected persons: Alain Frédéric Jost, Alex Jost, Max Jost You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
|
|
Dieter Jost
domiciled in Muttenz, from Eriswil Active mandates: Stiftung Job Factories, Stiftung Weizenkorn and more Connected persons: Andrea Zipperer, Robert Roth, Stefan Breidert and more You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
|
|
Dieter Jost
domiciled in Rodersdorf, from Basel Active mandates: Choose Integration Connected persons: Carol Ulmann, Sibylle Münch, Roger Zumkeller Buess and more You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dieter Jost", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Jost"
|
Places where people with the name Dieter Jost live
Sectors in which people with the name Dieter Jost work
Operation of investment companies
Services regarding management consulting
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Operation of investment companies
Services regarding management consulting
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Dieter Jost
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dieter Jost
Publication number: HR02-1005854325, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Partofina AG, in Lyss, CHE-102.688.726, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 20.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2278389). Gemäss Erklärung vom 02.10.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BDO AG (CHE-430.259.378), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Dieter, von Wynigen, in Ligerz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jost, Alain, von Wynigen, in Ligerz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jost, Alex, von Wynigen, in Twann (Twann-Tüscherz), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jost, Max, von Wynigen, in Lyss, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005630568, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Choose Integration, in Basel, CHE-104.340.702, Verein (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 07.07.2021, Publ. 1005242502).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schädler, Guido, von St. Gallen, in Rheinfelden, Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Dieter, von Basel, in Rodersdorf, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Münch, Sibylle, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005357184, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Acouver isol SA, à Develier, CHE-108.436.117, société anonyme (No. FOSC 161 du 22.08.2016, Publ. 3014463).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Jost, Dieter, de Wynigen, à Ligerz, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Descoeudres, Daniel, de La Sagne, à Grandvaux, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Gartenmann Ruetz, Christina, de Bronschhofen et Winterthur, à Berne, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Mussi, Gilberto, d'Italie, à Enges, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Catellani, Silvio Oswald, de Valbroye, à Granges-près-Marnand (Valbroye), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Catellani, Lionel Florian, de Valbroye, à Granges-près-Marnand (Valbroye), membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Catellani, Thomas Lino, de Valbroye, à Estavayer-le-Lac (Estavayer), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Kornmayer, André Marcel, de Saignelégier, à Bassecourt (Haute-Sorne), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Patrick André Reynald Ryter et Antonio Restaino;
Restaino, Antonio, de Lucens, à Servion, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec André Marcel Kornmayer et Patrick André Reynald Ryter;
Ryter, Patrick André Reynald, de Genève, à Courrendlin, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec André Marcel Kornmayer et Antonio Restaino.