Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici
domiciled in Horw, from Italy Active mandates: Projektmanagement Medici AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici"
|
Places where people with the name Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici live
Sectors in which people with the name Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lorenzo I. Incerti Medici
Publication number: 4353833, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
CoolArts AG, in Luzern, CHE-390.606.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2018, Publ. 4065939).
Statutenänderung:
06.07.2018.
Sitz neu:
Inwil.
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 3, 6034 Inwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Incerti Medici, Lorenzo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Horw, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Lässig, Jan Patrick, von Zollikon, in Aarau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jacovic, Miroslav, von Luzern, in Inwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Jacovic, Nemanja, von Luzern, in Luzern, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4065957, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Projektmanagement Medici AG, in Luzern, CHE-106.439.470, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 23.07.2012, Publ. 6781270).
Domizil neu:
Oberseeburghöhe 8, 6006 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fürholz, Matthias, von Biberist, in Hägendorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Incerti Medici, Lorenzo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Horw, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3887859, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Aktiengesellschaft vorm. Rey Schule, in Ebikon, CHE-105.914.971, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2010, Publ. 5808902).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Incerti Medici, Lorenzo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Horw, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Arioli, Beat Alexander, genannt Alex, von Gurtnellen, in Ebikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lufida Revisions AG (CHE-107.870.600), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Lufida Revisions AG, in Luzern (CH-100.3.007.813-6)].