Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld
domiciled in Zermatt, from Lungern Active mandates: Fondation Alpes-Encre de Chine Connected persons: Toni Carbonara, Vincent Paul Castagna, Pierre Vogt and more You can stay up to date through "Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld"
|
Places where people with the name Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld live
Sectors in which people with the name Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Gérald Jean Francesco Imfeld
Publication number: 1407873, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
ITS Foundation. International Tourism Symposium, à Martigny, CHE-114.965.996, fondation (No. FOSC 147 du 02.08.2013, Publ. 1011077).
Nouveau nom:
ITS Foundation. International Tourism Symposium en liquidation. Par décision du 06.01.2014, le Département de la formation et de la sécurité du canton du Valais a prononcé la dissolution de la fondation.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Imfeld, Gérald, de Lungern, à Zermatt, président et directeur général et liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président et directeur général avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 1031413, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation Alpes-Encre de Chine, in Zermatt, CH-600.7.015.062-8, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2012, Publ. 6758392).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imfeld, Dante, von Lungern, in Vétroz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aubert, Yves Claude, von Le Chenit, in Echandens, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Imfeld, Michèle Armande, von Lungern, in Puidoux, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten [bisher: Imfeld, Michèle];
Imfeld, Gérald Jean Francesco, von Lungern, in Zermatt, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Imfeld, Gérald].
Publication number: 6758392, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation Alpes-Encre de Chine, in Zermatt, CH-600.7.015.062-8, Seilerwiesenstrasse 11, 3920 Zermatt, Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
21.06.2012.
Zweck:
Förderung von künstlerischem und kulturellem Austausch zwischen der Schweiz und China. Erstellung und Entwicklung einer Plattform zur Verbesserung der Kenntnis der chinesischen Kultur in der Schweiz und weltweit. Vertretung der Vereinigung chinesischer Künstler für den kulturellen und künstlerischen Austausch mit China.
Eingetragene Personen:
Imfeld, Gérald, von Lungern, in Zermatt, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Imfeld, Michèle, von Lungern, in Puidoux, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Imfeld, Dante, von Lungern, in Vétroz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.