Urs Hugentobler
domiciled in Zürich, from Zürich and Uzwil Active mandates: Individuum Patricia Waser + Partner, Info Pro Consulting, Hugentobler + Partner Connected persons: Patricia Waser, Patricia Waser You can stay up to date through "Urs Hugentobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Hugentobler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Hugentobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Hugentobler"
|
|
Urs Hugentobler
domiciled in Lindau, from Amlikon-Bissegg Active mandates: Genossenschaft 'Chrummenacher', Lindau Connected persons: Daniel Jemric, Sarah Martina Wohlgemuth-Rüdin, Katharina Wolfensberger You can stay up to date through "Urs Hugentobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Hugentobler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Hugentobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Hugentobler"
|
Places where people with the name Urs Hugentobler live
Sectors in which people with the name Urs Hugentobler work
Other social services
Other services in education
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other social services
Other services in education
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Urs Hugentobler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Hugentobler
Publication number: HR02-1005356825, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hugentobler Engineering GmbH, in Wigoltingen, CHE-109.302.459, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 30.05.2013, S.0, Publ. 7208134).
Firma neu:
Hugentobler Engineering GmbH in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
Eggrainstrasse 3, 8556 Wigoltingen. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 03.12.2021 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hugentobler, Urs, von Wigoltingen, in Wigoltingen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2147583, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Belimed Sauter AG, in Sulgen, CHE-102.132.653, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 17.11.2014, Publ. 1825661).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reber, Beat, von Linden, in Moosseedorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hugentobler, Urs, von Amlikon-Bissegg, in Sitterdorf (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wachter, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bottighofen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schmid, Stefan, von Ittigen, in Moosseedorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1297515, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
H. & H. Bauschreinerei GmbH, in Gachnang, CHE-107.627.933, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 24.12.2009, S. 23, Publ. 5411932).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hugentobler, Urs, von Amlikon-Bissegg, in Islikon (Gachnang), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hugentobler, Fritz, von Amlikon-Bissegg, in Gachnang, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Hugentobler, Marlise, von Amlikon-Bissegg, in Gachnang, mit Einzelunterschrift.