Andreas Peter Hubmann
domiciled in Oberägeri, from Bichelsee-Balterswil Active mandates: BIACOMET AG, Point Capital Group AG and more Connected persons: Christian Falk, Tarik Meier, Alexander Konstantin Iten and more You can stay up to date through "Andreas Peter Hubmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Peter Hubmann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andreas Peter Hubmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Peter Hubmann"
|
Places where people with the name Andreas Peter Hubmann live
Sectors in which people with the name Andreas Peter Hubmann work
Trading with various goods
Fund management
Operation of other financial institutions
Trading with various goods
Fund management
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Andreas Peter Hubmann
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andreas Peter Hubmann
Publication number: HR02-1006067476, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
BIACOMET AG, in Zug, CHE-231.404.067, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 21.05.2024, Publ. 1006035648).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hubmann, Andreas Peter, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in Oberägeri, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004877583, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Point Capital Group AG, in Zug, CHE-336.027.015, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 01.05.2019, Publ. 1004620762).
Statutenänderung:
20.04.2020.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 6'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 5'000'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 6'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 5'000'000.00].
Aktien neu:
6'000'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 5'000'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00]. Ordentliche Kapitalerhöhung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peter, Martin, von Neftenbach, in Opfikon, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hubmann, Andreas Peter, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in Zug, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sutter, Christian Moritz, von Pfäfers, in Dübendorf, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004686976, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Advance Trading SA, in Baar, CHE-103.300.456, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 04.05.2017, Publ. 3502579).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hubmann, Andreas Peter, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burton, John William, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.