Christian Gersbach
domiciled in Möhlin, from Wallbach Active mandates: Eulenhof lewiwo Genossenschaft Connected persons: Sabina Burazerovic, Marco Buchmüller, Maité Klockenbring and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Gersbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gersbach"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Gersbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gersbach"
|
|
Christian Gersbach
domiciled in Zürich, from Aarau and Wallbach Active mandates: NIKE (Switzerland) GmbH in Liquidation, A.T. Kearney (International) AG and more Connected persons: Rosanne Johanna Stevens, Adnan Karaca, Gisela Hämmerling and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Gersbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gersbach"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Gersbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gersbach"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Gersbach live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Gersbach work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Advertising services
Services regarding management consulting
Trading with machines
Notary and advocate office
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Advertising services
Services regarding management consulting
Trading with machines
Notary and advocate office
Private persons with the name Christian Gersbach
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Gersbach
Publication number: HR02-1005719912, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
NIKE (Switzerland) GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-106.089.157, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 13.04.2022, Publ. 1005449698).
Firma neu:
NIKE (Switzerland) GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 31.03.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meijer, Milou, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Hilversum (NL), Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gersbach, Christian, von Wallbach, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005036096, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Eulenhof lewiwo Genossenschaft, in Möhlin, CHE-245.048.458, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 05.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1699905).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Beck, Christian, von Sumiswald, in Brittnau, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Beck, Maja, von Sumiswald und Zürich, in Brittnau, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klockenbring, Maité, von Altstätten, in Möhlin, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gersbach, Christian, von Wallbach, in Möhlin, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wallbach];
Buchmüller, Marco, von Brittnau, in Möhlin, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Burazerovic, Sabina, von Schöftland, in Möhlin, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2770393, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
NIKE (Switzerland) GmbH, in Rümlang, CHE-106.089.157, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 29.02.2016, Publ. 2692489).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Erlach, Dr. Rudolf, von Bern, in Maur, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sechterberger, Marijke Leonoor, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Frankfurt am Main (DE), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Amsterdam (NL)];
Gersbach, Christian, von Wallbach, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.