Simon Gantner
domiciled in Madiswil, from Grabs Active mandates: IndustrialBoard GmbH in Liquidation, RoVi Holding AG and more Connected persons: Silvan Flury, Peter Schüpbach, Silvan Lutz and more You can stay up to date through "Simon Gantner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Simon Gantner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Simon Gantner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Simon Gantner"
|
Places where people with the name Simon Gantner live
Sectors in which people with the name Simon Gantner work
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Business management and administration
Operation of investment companies
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Business management and administration
Operation of investment companies
Private persons with the name Simon Gantner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Simon Gantner
Publication number: HR02-1005761209, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
IndustrialBoard GmbH, in Langenthal, CHE-443.785.601, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 04.12.2012, S.0, Publ. 6959326).
Firma neu:
IndustrialBoard GmbH in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(IndustrialBoard LLC in liquidation) (IndustrialBoard Sàrl en liquidation).
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Daetwyler Global Tec Holding, Flugplatz, 3368 Bleienbach. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 16.02.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
NewBorn Capital Holding AG (CH-020.3.029.335-0), in Langenthal, Gesellschafterin, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Daetwyler Global Tec Holding AG (CHE-102.582.476), in Bleienbach, Gesellschafterin, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Daetwyler Global Tec Holding AG ];
NewBorn Capital AG (CHE-109.386.700), in Langenthal, Gesellschafterin, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Gantner, Simon, von Grabs, in Madiswil, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Jegenstorf, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005652627, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
MDC Max Daetwyler AG Ursenbach, in Ursenbach, CHE-101.753.344, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2017, Publ. 3586835).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gantner, Simon, von Grabs, in Niederönz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bäurer, Dietmar, von Zeihen, in Reitnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bütikofer, Johann, von Kernenried, in Rohrbach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005637394, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
RoVi Holding AG, in Grenchen, CHE-258.662.716, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 19.05.2022, Publ. 1005477685).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kröger, Jürgen, von Schluein, in Rupperswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gantner, Simon, von Grabs, in Madiswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lutz, Silvan, von Thal, in Oberburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.