Heinz Engler
domiciled in Bazenheid, from Sevelen Active mandates: SOLENG GmbH, WHE Wald Holz Energie AG and more Connected persons: Margrith Engler-Eggenberger, Peter Engler, Christoph Rhiner and more You can stay up to date through "Heinz Engler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Engler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Heinz Engler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Engler"
|
Places where people with the name Heinz Engler live
Sectors in which people with the name Heinz Engler work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Sawmill operation
Trading with various goods
Associations and federations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Sawmill operation
Trading with various goods
Associations and federations
Private persons with the name Heinz Engler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Heinz Engler
Publication number: HR02-1005043298, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Waldwirtschaft St.Gallen & Liechtenstein (WVSG + FL), in Neckertal, CHE-103.918.662, Verein (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 24.06.2010, S.18, Publ. 5690842).
Statutenänderung:
04.11.2016.
Name neu:
Wald St. Gallen & Liechtenstein (WVSG + FL).
Organisation neu:
[gelöscht].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Näscher, Felix, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Eschen (LI), Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Büsser, Roger, von Schänis, in Schänis, Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Engler, Heinz, von Sevelen, in Bazenheid (Kirchberg (SG)), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bächli (Hemberg)].
Publication number: HR02-1004997810, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
WHE Wald Holz Energie AG, in Sennwald, CHE-182.357.779, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2011, S.0, Publ. 6242410).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schönauer, Ernst, von Rebstein, in Rebstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Engler, Heinz, von Sevelen, in Bazenheid (Kirchberg (SG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bächli (Hemberg)];
Hengartner, Jürg, von Häggenschwil, in Rebstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2233121, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Holzmarkt Ostschweiz AG, in Neckertal, CHE-114.601.287, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2011, Publ. 6334136). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 27.05.2015 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wälti Treuhand und Revisionen AG, in Bad Ragaz (CH-320.3.030.928-1), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Engler, Heinz, von Sevelen, in Bazenheid (Kirchberg SG), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bächli (Hemberg)].