Rahel Dudler
domiciled in Staad, from Thal Active mandates: Rudolf Dudler AG Connected persons: Rudolf Dudler-Benz, Myrtha Dudler-Benz, Larissa Cano and more You can stay up to date through "Rahel Dudler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rahel Dudler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rahel Dudler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rahel Dudler"
|
Places where people with the name Rahel Dudler live
Sectors in which people with the name Rahel Dudler work
Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof
Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof
Private persons with the name Rahel Dudler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rahel Dudler
Publication number: 1066951, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rudolf Dudler AG, in Thal, CH-320.3.038.999-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 26.09.2012, Publ. 6865238).
Statutenänderung:
03.09.2013.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft der im Handelsregister eingetragenen Kollektivgesellschaft 'Arnold Dudler + Co', in Altenrhein (Thal), gemäss Übernahmebilanz per 31.12.1994 mit Aktiven von CHF 6'173'091.90 und Passiven von CHF 1'532'770.05, wofür 1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 3'640'321.85 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.].Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend: Dudler, Rahel, von Thal, in Staad SG (Thal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Speicherschwendi (Eggersriet)];
Dudler, Rudolf, von Thal, in Staad SG (Thal), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Dudler-Benz, Rudolf].
Publication number: 6865238, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rudolf Dudler AG, in Thal, CH-320.3.038.999-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.1995, S. 3612).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dudler-Dudler, Arnold, von Thal, in Altenrhein (Thal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dudler-Benz, Myrtha, von Thal, in Staad SG (Thal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dudler, Larissa, von Thal, in Staad SG (Thal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dudler, Rahel, von Thal, in Speicherschwendi (Eggersriet), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater (CH-320.3.015.621-5), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.