François Dubuis
domiciled in Savièse, from Savièse Active mandates: Dubuis François Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "François Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Dubuis"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "François Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Dubuis"
|
|
François Dubuis
domiciled in Ollon, from Savièse Active mandates: Fonds de prévoyance pour le personnel de la Société suisse des hôteliers et de ses Institutions Connected persons: Patrick Savioli, Regina Sonia Cid Nieto, Barbara Friedrich and more You can stay up to date through "François Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Dubuis"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "François Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Dubuis"
|
Places where people with the name François Dubuis live
Sectors in which people with the name François Dubuis work
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Operation of an pension fund
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Operation of an pension fund
Private persons with the name François Dubuis
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: François Dubuis
Publication number: HR02-1005774563, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation pour la sauvegarde du patrimoine historique de Drône, à Savièse, CHE-115.098.273, fondation (No. FOSC 60 du 25.03.2011, p.0, Publ. 6093060).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Lucien Zuchuat, Rue de la Combettaz 14, 1965 Savièse.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Dubuis, François, de Savièse, à Savièse, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Varone, Stéphane, de Savièse, à Savièse, membre, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Zuchuat, Lucien, de Savièse, à Savièse, président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Nabais Clemente, Sabine, de Anniviers, à Savièse, membre et secrétaire du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005223945, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
François DUBUIS, Carrelages SA, à Sion, CHE-114.331.047, société anonyme (No. FOSC 84 du 01.05.2020, Publ. 1004881690).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Dubuis, François, de Savièse, à Savièse, membre du conseil, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005119596, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
DIMO SA, à Monthey, CHE-238.580.765, société anonyme (No. FOSC 126 du 03.07.2014, Publ. 1590995).
Modification des statuts:
26.02.2021.
Actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 avec restriction de transmissibilité selon statuts [précédemment: 100 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000.00].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Dubuis, Luc Joseph, de Sierre, à Monthey, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Dubuis, François Bernard, de Sierre et Savièse, à Plan-les-Ouates, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.