Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes
domiciled in Büron, from Büron Active mandates: Wasser & Wärme GmbH Connected persons: Daniel Scheidegger You can stay up to date through "Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes"
|
Places where people with the name Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes live
Sectors in which people with the name Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes work
Other construction
Other construction
Private persons with the name Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Nelson Alexandre dos Santos Lopes
Publication number: HR02-1004628671, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Wasser & Wärme GmbH, in Gontenschwil, CHE-136.951.353, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2018, Publ. 4369613).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
dos Santos Lopes, Nelson, von Büron, in Büron, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Scheidegger, Daniel, von Bönigen, in Rickenbach (LU), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 4369613, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Wasser & Wärme GmbH, in Aarau, CHE-136.951.353, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 30.05.2016, Publ. 2858601).
Statutenänderung:
06.07.2018.
Sitz neu:
Gontenschwil.
Domizil neu:
Schwarzenberg 307, 5728 Gontenschwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frischknecht, Hans Peter, von Schwellbrunn, in Suhr, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 5'000.00;
Sopjani, Fatmir, von Klingnau, in Klingnau, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
dos Santos Lopes, Nelson, von Büron, in Büron, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 4296455, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hug Sanitär + Heizungen AG, in Reinach (AG), CHE-114.282.472, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2016, Publ. 3230865).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
dos Santos Lopes, Nelson Alexandre, von Büron, in Büron, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.