Felix Deutsch
domiciled in Gstaad, from Aarau Active mandates: Aero-Club der Schweiz, arcontrix GmbH Connected persons: Markus Arn, Eugen Thomas Maria Stieger, Claudia Josefa Eva Zürcher-Fabjan and more You can stay up to date through "Felix Deutsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Felix Deutsch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Felix Deutsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Felix Deutsch"
|
|
Felix Deutsch
domiciled in Oberaach, from Märstetten Active mandates: Kummer Werkzeugbau AG Connected persons: Peggy Anne Eggenberger You can stay up to date through "Felix Deutsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Felix Deutsch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Felix Deutsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Felix Deutsch"
|
Places where people with the name Felix Deutsch live
Sectors in which people with the name Felix Deutsch work
Sport services
Services regarding management consulting
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Sport services
Services regarding management consulting
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Private persons with the name Felix Deutsch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Felix Deutsch
Publication number: HR02-1005643548, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
arcontrix GmbH, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-112.914.686, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 05.10.2009, S.4, Publ. 5276422).
Statutenänderung:
21.12.2022.
Sitz neu:
Saanen.
Domizil neu:
Staldenweg 11, 3780 Gstaad.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Deutsch, Felix, von Aarau, in Gstaad (Saanen), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Grossaffoltern].
Publication number: HR02-1004966933, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Ghielmetti AG, in Biberist, CHE-103.747.538, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 20.05.2020, Publ. 1004893735).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wasem, Bernhard, genannt Bernard, von Rüschegg, in Laufen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Deutsch, Felix, von Aarau, in Grossaffoltern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004695781, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Brugg Kabel AG, in Brugg, CHE-105.960.250, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2019, Publ. 1004680171).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Deutsch, Felix, von Aarau, in Grossaffoltern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mäder, Yves, von Mörschwil, in Zollikofen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zarotti, Janina, von Landquart, in Dübendorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.