Christophe Carron
domiciled in Susten, from Fully Active mandates: PRA Ingénieurs conseils SA Connected persons: Christian Dumoulin, Sébastien Menoud, Pierre Epars and more You can stay up to date through "Christophe Carron", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christophe Carron"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christophe Carron", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christophe Carron"
|
|
Christophe Carron
domiciled in Fully, from Fully Active mandates: Isalex Sàrl en liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Christophe Carron", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christophe Carron"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christophe Carron", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christophe Carron"
|
Places where people with the name Christophe Carron live
Sectors in which people with the name Christophe Carron work
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Christophe Carron
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christophe Carron
Publication number: HR02-1006106706, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PRA Ingénieurs conseils SA, à Sion, CHE-101.447.338, société anonyme (No. FOSC 3 du 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644900).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Michel, Pierre, de Grindelwald, à Grimisuat, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Carron, Christophe, de Fully, à Leuk, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux];
Dumoulin, Christian, de Savièse, à Sion, administrateur et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Pitteloud, Laurent, de Vex, à Vex, administrateur, vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président et vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: HR02-1005644900, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PRA Ingénieurs conseils SA, à Sion, CHE-101.447.338, société anonyme (No. FOSC 137 du 18.07.2019, Publ. 1004679330).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Carron, Christophe, de Fully, à Visp, administrateur et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux];
Menoud, Sébastien, de Sâles, à Vex, administrateur, directeur, avec signature collective à deux, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux, avec signature collective à deux];
Michel, Pierre, de Grindelwald, à Grimisuat, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur et directeur, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 3397063, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Isalex Sàrl, précédemment à Lutry, CHE-102.116.217, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 101 du 28.05.2009, p. 16, Publ. 5040326).
Statuts originaires:
10.03.1993.
Modification des statuts:
28.02.2017.
Nouveau siège:
Bagnes.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o FIMOB Bureau Fiduciaire et Immobilier S.A., Route de Clouchèvre 22, Case postale 77, 1934 Le Châble VS.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Winkler, Elisabeth, de Fischingen, à Lutry, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Carron, Christophe, de Fully, à Fully, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.