Martin Caduff
domiciled in Dübendorf, from Ilanz/Glion Active mandates: Digital Marketing Holding AG, Adisfaction-Annex AG and more Connected persons: Marco Pfister, Beat Nuotclà You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
|
|
Martin Caduff
domiciled in Trin, from Lumnezia Active mandates: Treuhand Bezzola + Partner AG, Treuhand Center Beteiligungs AG and more Connected persons: Ramun Grond, Beat Bardill, Gerda Monika Meier Kernen and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
|
|
Martin Caduff
domiciled in Ilanz, from Breil/Brigels Active mandates: Confidar Treuhand AG Connected persons: Manuel Flepp, Othmar Seiler, René Cavegn and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Caduff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Caduff"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Caduff live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Caduff work
Operation of other financial institutions
Advertising services
Architectural and engineering activities
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Trading in food products
Operation of other financial institutions
Advertising services
Architectural and engineering activities
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Trading in food products
Private persons with the name Martin Caduff
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Caduff
Publication number: HR02-1005780516, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Confidar Treuhand AG, in Ilanz/Glion, CHE-101.913.286, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2023, Publ. 1005679071).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Sunside Treuhand- und Verwaltungs AG (CHE-106.014.780), in Laax, gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 17.05.2023 und Bilanz per 01.01.2023. Aktiven von CHF 1'059'524.35 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 422'129.95 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cavegn, René, von Breil/Brigels, in Ilanz/Glion, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Breil/Brigels, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Caduff, Martin, von Breil/Brigels, in Ilanz/Glion, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Breil/Brigels, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Flepp, Manuel, von Disentis/Mustér, in Disentis/Mustér, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Caduff, Richard, von Breil/Brigels, in Breil/Brigels, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Tavanasa (Breil/Brigels), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005704374, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Treuhand Bezzola + Partner AG, in Zernez, CHE-107.056.491, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 05.05.2020, Publ. 1004883237).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bezzola, Jachen, von Zernez, in Zernez, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bardill, Beat, von Luzein, in Zizers, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Caduff, Martin, von Lumnezia, in Trin, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005693079, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Forward Advertising Holding GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-285.196.852, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 24.02.2022, Publ. 1005413026).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Caduff, Martin, von Ilanz/Glion, in Dübendorf, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wieland, Sonam, von Chur, in Basel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].