Flamur Bunjaku
domiciled in Uitikon Waldegg, from Weiningen (ZH) Active mandates: Property BR AG, Liel AG and more Connected persons: Blerim Rexhepi, Shaban Konxheli, Habib Leci and more You can stay up to date through "Flamur Bunjaku", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Flamur Bunjaku"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Flamur Bunjaku", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Flamur Bunjaku"
|
Places where people with the name Flamur Bunjaku live
Sectors in which people with the name Flamur Bunjaku work
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Rental of automotive
Operation of clubs and discotheques
Temp agency services
Postal and courier services
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Rental of automotive
Operation of clubs and discotheques
Temp agency services
Postal and courier services
Private persons with the name Flamur Bunjaku
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Flamur Bunjaku
Publication number: HR02-1005981834, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Meier-Kopp Service AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.255.946, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2023, Publ. 1005843293).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bunjaku, Flamur, von Schlieren, in Schlieren, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005452349, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Meier-Kopp Service AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.255.946, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2021, Publ. 1005356129).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bunjaku, Flamur, von Schlieren, in Schlieren, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Leuter, Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wehr (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1675875, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Roel AG, in Cham, CHE-157.424.527, Alte Steinhauserstrasse 19, 6330 Cham, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
07.07.2014.
Zweck:
Ausführung von Bau- und Baumeisterarbeiten im Hoch-, Tief- und Innenausbau, Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Bauführung, Architektur und als Generalunternehmen, Handel, Vermittlung sowie Verwaltung von Immobilien und Liegenschaften, Handel, Im- und Export und Vermietung von und mit Fahr- und Nutzfahrzeugen sowie mit Waren und Maschinen aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 09.07.2014 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Bunjaku, Flamur, von Weiningen ZH, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.