Christoph Bütler
domiciled in Samedan, from Schongau Active mandates: Metelcom AG, BIKE SCHOOL ENGADIN GmbH in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Laura Breitenmoser, David Spielmann, Fabrizio D'Aloisio and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Bütler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Bütler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Bütler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Bütler"
|
|
Christoph Bütler
domiciled in Bussnang, from Hünenberg Active mandates: Lebenspraxis GmbH, Bütler Connected persons: Renate Irma Bütler You can stay up to date through "Christoph Bütler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Bütler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Bütler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Bütler"
|
Places where people with the name Christoph Bütler live
Sectors in which people with the name Christoph Bütler work
Architectural and engineering activities
Other services in education
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Trading with various goods
Architectural and engineering activities
Other services in education
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Christoph Bütler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christoph Bütler
Publication number: HR02-1006067790, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Metelcom AG, in Chur, CHE-333.445.994, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 16.06.2021, Publ. 1005219096).
Hauptsitz in:
Samedan.
Domizil neu:
Gürtelstrasse 11, 7000 Chur.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Barandun, Marius A., von Feldis/Veulden, in Chur, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bütler, Christoph, von Schongau, in Samedan, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005912863, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
BIKE SCHOOL ENGADIN GmbH, in Samedan, CHE-253.985.661, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2019, Publ. 1004667853).
Firma neu:
BIKE SCHOOL ENGADIN GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 08.12.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
D'Aloisio, Fabrizio, von Klosters, in St. Moritz, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Klosters-Serneus, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Spielmann, David, von Davos, in Samedan, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Breitenmoser, Laura, von Zürich, in Samedan, Geschäftsführerin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bütler, Christoph, von Schongau, in Samedan, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, Gesellschafter, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004946773, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Metelcom AG, in Samedan, CHE-106.127.906, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 19.05.2016, S.0, Publ. 2839903).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bütler, Christoph, von Schongau, in Samedan, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.