André Bürgi
domiciled in Bülach, from Neftenbach and Bülach Active mandates: B & W GmbH Connected persons: Anja Weckherlin You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
|
|
André Bürgi
domiciled in Kestenholz, from Kestenholz Active mandates: CSB System AG Schweiz Connected persons: Pascal Rudolf von Rohr, Max Studer, Vanessa Kröner-Schimitzek and more You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
|
|
André Bürgi
domiciled in Goldau, from Arth Active mandates: Bürgi-Infra-Grill & Küchenmaschinen AG Connected persons: Josef Maria Bürgi-Felder, Roman Bürgi, Marie Bürgi-Felder You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
|
|
André Bürgi
domiciled in Bassersdorf, from Zeihen Active mandates: Trachsel Bürgi & Partner KLG Connected persons: Alexander Prechtl, Nadine Barbara Kieser Blöchlinger, Marc Trachsel You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "André Bürgi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "André Bürgi"
|
Places where people with the name André Bürgi live
Sectors in which people with the name André Bürgi work
Other social services
IT services
Manufacturing of household appliances
Notary and advocate office
Other social services
IT services
Manufacturing of household appliances
Notary and advocate office
Private persons with the name André Bürgi
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: André Bürgi
Publication number: HR02-1005990412, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ERNE AG Holzbau, in Laufenburg, CHE-101.987.959, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2024, Publ. 1005950158).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgi, Andreas, von Frick, in Frick, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyss, Roger, von Breitenbach, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005955017, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Sterbehospiz Solothurn, in Derendingen, CHE-130.701.131, Verein (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2023, Publ. 1005854585).
Statutenänderung:
07.12.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pitschen Loderer, Cristina Sabrina, von Mendrisio, in Oberwil bei Büren, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürgi, Andrea Susanna, von Aarberg, in Ersigen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005641320, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Leichtbetontechnik HQ GmbH, in Arth, CHE-105.441.091, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2017, Publ. 3259337).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fehlmann-Bertschi, Marianne, von Aarau, in Risch, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00;
Bertschi, Urs, von Dürrenäsch, in Zug, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00;
Fehlmann, Matthias, von Aarau, in Buonas, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürgi, Andreas, von Oberägeri, in Boswil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.