Walter Brutsche
domiciled in Naters, from Leibstadt Active mandates: Treuhandbüro Brutsche & Co., Treuhandbureau Brutsche Connected persons: Linus Fux You can stay up to date through "Walter Brutsche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Brutsche"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Walter Brutsche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Brutsche"
|
Places where people with the name Walter Brutsche live
Sectors in which people with the name Walter Brutsche work
Fiduciary services
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Walter Brutsche
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Walter Brutsche
Publication number: HR02-1004718125, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Hanny + René Schraner-Huggler-Stiftung, in Visp, CHE-109.994.288, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 08.06.2015, S.0, Publ. 2192773).
Name neu:
Hanny + René Schraner-Huggler-Stiftung in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 12.08.2019 aufgehoben.
Liquidationsadresse:
c/o Herrn Walter Brutsche, Rhodaniastrasse 8, 3904 Naters.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brutsche, Walter, von Leibstadt, in Naters, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6615136, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Oberwalliser Winterhilfe, in Naters, CH-600.7.001.365-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 17.02.2009, S. 23, Publ. 4884888).
Domizil neu:
c/o Dr. Hermann Schmid, Bahnhofstrasse 20, 3904 Naters. [Neue] Weitere Adresse: c/o Peter Imboden, Kleegärtenstrasse 13, 3930 Visp.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brutsche, Walter, von Leibstadt, in Naters, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Peter, von St. Niklaus und Visp, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4884888, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Stiftung Oberwalliser Winterhilfe, in Naters, CH-600.7.001.365-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 18.02.2005, S. 14, Publ. 2710234).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amacker, Markus, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brutsche, Walter, von Leibstadt, in Naters, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Carlen, Philipp Dr., von Brig-Glis und Reckingen-Gluringen, in Brig-Glis, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Studer, Philipp, von Stalden VS, in Stalden VS, Mitglied und Sekretär des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Imhasly & Planche Treuhand AG (600.3.001.164-4), in Brig-Glis, Revisionsstelle.