Péter Bordás
domiciled in Ennetbaden, from Hungary Active mandates: Bordstudio GmbH Connected persons: Tamás Tolvaj You can stay up to date through "Péter Bordás", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Péter Bordás"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Péter Bordás", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Péter Bordás"
|
Places where people with the name Péter Bordás live
Sectors in which people with the name Péter Bordás work
Architectural and engineering activities
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Péter Bordás
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Péter Bordás
Publication number: HR02-1006124515, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bordstudio GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-187.588.754, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2021, Publ. 1005268530).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bordás, Péter, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ennetbaden, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 14 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Neuenhof];
Tolvaj, Tamás, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ennetbaden, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Neuenhof].
Publication number: 4365793, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2018 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 23'108 vom 28.06.2018 Bordstudio GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-187.588.754, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2018, Publ. 4330621).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bordás, Péter, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Neuenhof, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 14 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [nicht: Bodás, Péter].
Publication number: 4253937, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bord Architekten AG vormals Berke Architekten, in Zürich, CHE-308.101.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 09.04.2018, Publ. 4157367).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bordás, Péter, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Budapest (HU), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.