Rudolf Aellig
domiciled in Zürich, from Adelboden Active mandates: FINOPSTA AG Connected persons: Petra Aellig, Alex Aellig You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Aellig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Aellig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Aellig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Aellig"
|
Places where people with the name Rudolf Aellig live
Sectors in which people with the name Rudolf Aellig work
Leasing of intangible assets
Leasing of intangible assets
Private persons with the name Rudolf Aellig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rudolf Aellig
Publication number: HR02-1005723541, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FINOPSTA AG, bisher in Stans, CHE-101.031.825, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2018, Publ. 1004499363).
Statutenänderung:
17.03.2023.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Kettberg 31, 8049 Zürich.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wüst, Bruno, von Birrhard, in Buchs (ZH), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aelllig, Petra, von Muri bei Bern, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Aellig, Rudolf, von Adelboden, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005529751, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
e24 AG, in Zürich, CHE-113.969.336, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 19.11.2018, Publ. 1004500225).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aellig, Rudolf, von Adelboden, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Michael, von Etziken, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schümperli, Alexander, von Wäldi, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4242683, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ERGONOMICS AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.358.147, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2018, Publ. 4092933).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aellig, Rudolf, von Adelboden, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.