Reports for Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband
- Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband has its legal headquarters in Glattbrugg and is active. It is an Association and active in the industry «Other schools on secondary school niveau».
- The management of the organization Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 03.07.1947.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 26.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband is registered under the UID CHE-107.826.102.
- On the same address there are 39 other active companies registered. These include: A&O Elektro AG, Baggenstos AG, benefitIMPACT AG.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
Oliver Pablo Dubs,
Stefan Weingart,
Marco Hischier,
Norberto Smaniotto,
Rolf Eugster
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.07.1947
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.900.674-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.826.102
Sector
Other schools on secondary school niveau
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der ZSV bezweckt als Regionalsektion des SVZ den Zusammenschluss der selbständigerwerbenden Schreinermeister, Fenster- und Möbelfabrikanten in seinem Verbandsgebiet. Diesen Zweck sucht er insbesondere wie folgt zu erreichen: a) Pflege des Einvernehmens unter den Mitgliedern. b) Förderung der beruflichen Aus- und Weiterbildung. c) Öffentlichkeitsarbeit im Rahmen der PR-Aktion 'Züri-Schreiner'. d) Wahrung von kollegialen Beziehungen untereinander, Förderung des Kontaktes und des Erfahrungsaustausches zwischen den Mitgliedern. e) Veranstaltung von gemeinsamen Anlässen zur Stärkung der Kollegialität. f) Organisation und Durchführung der jeweiligen ordentlichen und ausserordentlichen Generalversammlung des SVZ, alternierend mit den anderen Regionalsektionen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Crowe Curator Audit AG | Zürich | 15.03.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006094564, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband, in Opfikon, CHE-107.826.102, Verein (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2021, Publ. 1005334716).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gutzwiller, Beat Hans, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bosshard, Markus, von Zürich und Sternenberg, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Salzgeber, Melanie, von Winterthur, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Staubli, Werner, von Unterlunkhofen, in Wallisellen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hischier, Marco, von Urdorf, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Smaniotto, Norberto, von Glarus Nord, in Reichenburg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dubs, Oliver, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Weingart, Stefan, von Radelfingen, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005334716, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband, in Opfikon, CHE-107.826.102, Verein (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2019, Publ. 1004588345).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Crowe Curator Audit AG (CHE-105.847.033), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Curator Revision AG (CHE-105.847.033)].
Publication number: HR02-1004588345, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zürcher Schreinermeister-Verband, in Opfikon, CHE-107.826.102, Verein (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 21.08.2017, Publ. 3704877).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Curator Revision AG (CHE-105.847.033), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.