Address
c/o Bendicht Hauswirth
Mattenstrasse 98
3780 Gstaad
Reports for Zückerli Wispile AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zückerli Wispile AG
- Zückerli Wispile AG has its legal headquarters in Gstaad and is active. It operates in the sector «Other booking services».
- Zückerli Wispile AG was founded on 08.12.2004.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.06.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-112.136.523.
Management (5)
newest board members
Reto Burri,
Arnold Hauswirth,
Bendicht Hauswirth-Röthlisberger,
Christof Jost Huber,
Daniel von Siebenthal
newest authorized signatories
Reto Burri,
Arnold Hauswirth,
Bendicht Hauswirth-Röthlisberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.12.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saanen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.016.880-6
UID/VAT
CHE-112.136.523
Sector
Other booking services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Transport- und Beförderungsanlagen sowie Tourismusaktivitäten und Handel mit Liegenschaften. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Liegenschaften erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KMU-Revisionen AG | Bern | 09.12.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. oec. H.P. Bieri Steuer-, Finanz- und Wirtschaftsberatung AG Thun | Thun | 14.12.2004 | 08.12.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zückerli Wispile AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005504986, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zückerli Wispile AG, in Saanen, CHE-112.136.523, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 04.09.2020, Publ. 1004971665).
Domizil neu:
c/o Bendicht Hauswirth, Mattenstrasse 98, 3780 Gstaad.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Grünigen, Johann Peter, von Saanen, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burri, Reto, von Boltigen, in Lauenen b. Gstaad (Lauenen), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004971665, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zückerli Wispile AG, in Saanen, CHE-112.136.523, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 09.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1868339).
Domizil neu:
c/o Johann Peter von Grünigen, Promenade 20, 3780 Gstaad.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Burri-Brand, Arnold, von Boltigen, in Lauenen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brand-Ellenberger, Heinz, von Saanen, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kübli-Kaufmann, Hansruedi, von Gsteig, in Gsteig, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauswirth, Bendicht, von Saanen, in Gstaad (Saanen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hauswirth, Arnold, von Saanen, in Saanen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Hauswirth-Brand, Arnold, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
von Grünigen, Johann Peter, von Saanen, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Grünigen-Trainiti, Johann Peter, Mitglied + Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Huber, Christof Jost, von Luzern, in Gsteig b. Gstaad (Gsteig), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
von Siebenthal, Daniel, von Saanen, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1868339, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zückerli Wispile AG, in Saanen, CHE-112.136.523, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2005, S. 3, Publ. 2622662).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dr. oec. H.P. Bieri Steuer-, Finanz- und Wirtschaftsberatung AG Thun, in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
KMU-Revisionen AG Thun (CHE-460.709.133), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.