Reports for Zinggen Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zinggen Immobilien AG
- Zinggen Immobilien AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Mollis.
- The management of the company Zinggen Immobilien AG consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 30.07.2024.
- The company Zinggen Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-244.065.750.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Innotherm GmbH, PRIMING AG, Stahl Design AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.10.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.005.987-4
UID/VAT
CHE-244.065.750
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verkauf, Handel, Vermittlung, Vermietung und Verwaltung von Immobilien aller Art, sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen und Beratungen im Immobilienbereich und alle damit verbundenen Tätigkeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann sodann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die mit ihrem Zweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder die geeignet sind, diesen zu fördern. Sie kann namentlich Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Gesellschaften gründen, erwerben, sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen oder daran beteiligen oder auf andere Weise mit Dritten zusammenarbeiten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG | Glarus Nord | 06.10.2020 | 15.02.2022 | |
Verita Immobilien und Treuhand AG | Glarus Nord | 31.10.2016 | 05.10.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zinggen Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006096866, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Zinggen Immobilien AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-244.065.750, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2022, Publ. 1005406867).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stüssi, Thomas Herbert, von Glarus Nord, in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weber, Hansjörg, von Glarus Nord, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005406867, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Zinggen Immobilien AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-244.065.750, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2021, Publ. 1005349787). Gemäss Erklärung vom 09.02.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grossmann, Beat René, von Schwyz, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Elmer, Hans Peter, von Glarus Süd, in Uetliburg SG (Gommiswald), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG (CHE-101.686.179), in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stüssi, Thomas Herbert, von Glarus Nord, in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Weber, Nicole, von Glarus Nord, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005349787, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Zinggen Immobilien AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-244.065.750, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2020, Publ. 1004993339).
Domizil neu:
Erlenstrasse 3, 8753 Mollis.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.