Reports for Zeit Netzbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zeit Netzbau AG
- Zeit Netzbau AG in Thundorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Underground lines and sewage treatment plants». Zeit Netzbau AG is active.
- The management of the company Zeit Netzbau AG, which was founded on the 07.12.1990, consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 01.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register TG under the UID CHE-106.718.421.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.12.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thundorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.664-7
UID/VAT
CHE-106.718.421
Sector
Underground lines and sewage treatment plants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
EW-Netzbau, Kabel- und Freileitungsbau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fehr Treuhand GmbH | Frauenfeld | 22.04.2005 | 22.04.2009 | |
Fehr Treuhand | Warth-Weiningen | <2004 | 21.04.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zeit Netzbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006071793, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Zeit Netzbau AG, in Thundorf, CHE-106.718.421, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 18.09.2019, Publ. 1004718875).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zeit-Kaufmann, Bernhard, von Gachnang, in Thundorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rickenmann, Daniel, von Thundorf, in Thundorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rickenmann, Linda, von Thundorf und Jonschwil, in Thundorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004718875, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Zeit Netzbau AG, in Thundorf, CHE-106.718.421, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2018, Publ. 4436587).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zeit, Ursula, von Gachnang, in Thundorf, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: 4436587, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Zeit Netzbau AG, in Thundorf, CHE-106.718.421, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 23.04.2009, Publ. 4986398).
Domizil neu:
Aufhofen 44, 8512 Thundorf.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zeit-Kaufmann, Bernhard, von Gachnang, in Thundorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Fehr, Roland, von Wagenhausen, in Felben-Wellhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rickenmann, Daniel, von Thundorf, in Thundorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.