Reports for zbinden ag hägendorf
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout zbinden ag hägendorf
- zbinden ag hägendorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Hägendorf. zbinden ag hägendorf belongs to the industry «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 06.07.1988 and has 4 persons in its management.
- On the 30.05.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SO is CHE-106.308.046.
Management (4)
newest board members
Mario Roger Schenker,
Adrian Kiefer,
Matthias Kiefer,
Michael Kiefer
newest authorized signatories
Mario Roger Schenker,
Adrian Kiefer,
Matthias Kiefer,
Michael Kiefer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hägendorf
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-251.3.000.063-0
UID/VAT
CHE-106.308.046
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung von Garagenbetrieben, umfassend Handel, Vermietung, Reparatur und Wartung von Motorfahrzeugen bzw. Ersatzteilen sowie Betrieb von Tankstellen. Kann Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, verkaufen und verwalten, sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Herzog Treuhand AG | Stein (AG) | 30.05.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schenker & Partner AG | Däniken | 08.12.2020 | 29.05.2023 | |
WISTAG Revision AG | Thun | 26.03.2018 | 07.12.2020 | |
Firest GmbH | Sigriswil | 10.07.2002 | 25.03.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Garage Zbinden AG Hägendorf
- Autovermietung Stauffer AG
- Robert Walther Handels + Leasing AG
- Walther Robert Handels + Leasig AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: zbinden ag hägendorf
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005755830, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
zbinden ag hägendorf, in Hägendorf, CHE-106.308.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2020, Publ. 1005042032).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schenker & Partner AG (CHE-106.841.004), in Däniken, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kiefer, Adrian, von Starrkirch-Wil, in Hägendorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schenker, Mario, von Gretzenbach, in Küttigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Herzog Treuhand AG (CHE-106.004.497), in Stein (AG), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005042032, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
zbinden ag hägendorf, in Hägendorf, CHE-106.308.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 26.03.2018, Publ. 4134117).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WISTAG Revision AG (CHE-104.019.565), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schenker & Partner AG (CHE-106.841.004), in Däniken, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4134117, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
zbinden ag hägendorf, in Hägendorf, CHE-106.308.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2016, Publ. 3190111).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Firest GmbH, in Sigriswil, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
WISTAG Revision AG (CHE-104.019.565), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.