Reports for Zaugg AG Eggiwil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zaugg AG Eggiwil
- Zaugg AG Eggiwil with its legal headquarters in Eggiwil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof». Zaugg AG Eggiwil is active.
- The company was founded on 03.04.1997 and has 9 persons in its management.
- On the 29.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-108.590.439.
- The IPI database currently contains 7 trademarks or applications for the company Zaugg AG Eggiwil.
Management (9)
newest board members
Christoph Bürgi,
Patrik Franz Robert Kilchmann,
Peter Rüegsegger,
Andres Michael Kromer,
Philippe Alain Hegi
newest authorized signatories
Wilhelm Rieder,
Michael Haunschild,
Christoph Bürgi,
Patrik Franz Robert Kilchmann,
Simon Winkenbach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.04.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eggiwil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.007.555-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.590.439
CHE-385.470.077 VAT
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von Maschinen, Geräten und Halbfabrikaten sowie Handel mit diesen Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben und verkaufen. Ein allfälliger Nebenzweck ist aus den Statuten ersichtlich.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG Bern | Bern | 10.06.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Walter Brönnimann | Burgdorf | <2004 | 09.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
17.05.2022 | active | 00708/2022 | |
Steamhydra | 07.02.2020 | active | 10968/2019 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Zaugg AG Eggiwil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116965, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zaugg AG Eggiwil, in Eggiwil, CHE-108.590.439, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 23.04.2024, Publ. 1006015303).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mannhart, René, von Flums, in Birr, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rieder, Wilhelm, von Frutigen, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006015303, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zaugg AG Eggiwil, in Eggiwil, CHE-108.590.439, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 16.01.2024, Publ. 1005935133).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haunschild, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Frauenkappelen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005935133, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zaugg AG Eggiwil, in Eggiwil, CHE-108.590.439, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2023, Publ. 1005703991).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brechbühl, Franziska, von Eriswil, in Langnau im Emmental, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kilchmann, Patrik, von Bad Ragaz, in Wirzweli (Dallenwil), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bürgi, Christoph, von Burgdorf und Aarberg, in Burgdorf, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Winkenbach, Simon, von Oberentfelden, in Ersigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.