Reports for Ynsentix Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ynsentix Holding AG
- Ynsentix Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Steffisburg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Business management and administration». Ynsentix Holding AG is active.
- Ynsentix Holding AG was founded on 15.10.2004.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.11.2018.
- The reported UID is CHE-112.041.348.
- 6 trademarks or applications for trademarks are currently registered in the IPI database.
- Next to the company Ynsentix Holding AG there are 5 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Oesch & Scheidegger GmbH, Swiss Franchising (Schweiz) AG, Tempro Personal GmbH.
Management (3)
newest board members
Rolf Blumenthal,
Peter Schüpbach,
Christine Wüthrich Schüpbach
newest authorized signatories
Rolf Blumenthal,
Peter Schüpbach,
Christine Wüthrich Schüpbach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.10.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Steffisburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.016.796-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.041.348
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art sowie damit zusammenhängende Koordinations-, Finanzierungs- und Managementaufgaben. Kann gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RoRa Treuhand + Revisions AG | Steffisburg | 29.03.2017 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KMU-Revisionen AG | Bern | 25.09.2014 | 28.03.2017 | |
Dr. oec. H.P. Bieri Steuer-, Finanz- und Wirtschaftsberatung AG Thun | Thun | 01.05.2013 | 24.09.2014 | |
Hinni Treuhand-Consulting | Köniz | 27.03.2009 | 30.04.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
myTempro | 09.08.2023 | active | 16147/2022 |
Tempro Care | 27.11.2020 | active | 02773/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Ynsentix Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004499269, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ynsentix Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-112.041.348, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 29.03.2017, Publ. 3432511).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bühlmann, Michel Silvester, von Beatenberg, in Thierachern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schüpbach, Peter, von Oberdiessbach, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Bleiken bei Oberdiessbach, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wüthrich Schüpbach, Christine, von Oberdiessbach und Trub, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Bleiken bei Oberdiessbach und Trub, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3432511, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ynsentix Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-112.041.348, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2016, Publ. 2998959).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KMU-Revisionen AG Thun, in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RoRa Treuhand + Revisions AG (CHE-251.285.529), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2998959, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ynsentix Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-112.041.348, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 25.09.2014, Publ. 1733369).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühlmann, Michel Silvester, von Beatenberg, in Thierachern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.