Reports for Xenis AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Xenis AG
- Xenis AG has its legal headquarters in Küsnacht ZH and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Services regarding public relations».
- Xenis AG was founded on 16.08.2007.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 11.01.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Xenis AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.774.198.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.08.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Küsnacht (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.031.360-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.774.198
Sector
Services regarding public relations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen im Relocation Bereich, sowie die Vermittlung von Geschäften Im Bereich der IT. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ggm Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Küsnacht (ZH) | 22.08.2007 | 09.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Xenis AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005069901, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Xenis AG, in Küsnacht (ZH), CHE-113.774.198, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2020, Publ. 1005052988).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rusca, Thomas, von Locarno, in Küsnacht (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005052988, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Xenis AG, in Küsnacht (ZH), CHE-113.774.198, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 30.06.2016, S.0, Publ. 2922531).
Statutenänderung:
03.12.2020.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen im Relocation Bereich, sowie die Vermittlung von Geschäften Im Bereich der IT. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Manz-von Arx, Ursula, von Oberbuchsiten, in Herrliberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rusca, Polia, von Locarno, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rusca, Thomas, von Locarno, in Küsnacht (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2922531, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Xenis AG, in Küsnacht ZH, CHE-113.774.198, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2011, S. 26, Publ. 6051732).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rusca-Schnyder, Franziska, von Locarno und Bern, in Küsnacht ZH, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Uetikon am See];
Manz-von Arx, Ursula, von Oberbuchsiten, in Herrliberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich];
Rusca, Polia, von Locarno, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Meilen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.