Reports for Wohnbaugenossenschaft "Wohnort Bern"
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohnbaugenossenschaft "Wohnort Bern"
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft "Wohnort Bern" from Bern operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 11.08.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.153.939.
Management (7)
newest members of the administration
Rita Karin Schweizer,
Rudolf Muggli,
Walter Kappeler,
Dominik Ruh,
Katharina Rebekka Kusano
newest authorized signatories
Rita Karin Schweizer,
Rudolf Muggli,
Walter Kappeler,
Dominik Ruh,
Katharina Rebekka Kusano
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.10.1976
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.5.000.912-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.153.939
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe und auf gemeinnütziger Grundlage die Wahrung der Interessen der Bewohner des Merzenackers sowie der baulichen Besonderheiten der Siedlung Merzenacker; die Verwaltung, Organisation und den rationellen Betrieb und Unterhalt des im Eigentum der Genossenschaft stehenden Grundbesitzes und der sich darauf befindenden Gebäulichkeiten, Anlagen und Einrichtungen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft 'Wohnort Bern'
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohnbaugenossenschaft "Wohnort Bern"
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005814671, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft 'Wohnort Bern', in Bern, CHE-102.153.939, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 17.02.2020, Publ. 1004831461).
Domizil neu:
Merzenacker 81, 3006 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steinlin, Walter, von Rebstein, in Bern, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Abegglen, Bernhard, von Iseltwald, in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretär der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muggli, Rudolf, von Rüschlikon, in Bern, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schweizer, Rita Karin, von Magden, in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004831461, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft 'Wohnort Bern', in Bern, CHE-102.153.939, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2019, Publ. 1004764668).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hammond, Philippe, von Pully, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kappeler, Walter, von Wattenwil, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004764668, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft 'Wohnort Bern', in Bern, CHE-102.153.939, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2017, Publ. 3420941).
Domizil neu:
c/o Walter Steinlin, Merzenacker 23, 3006 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Moor, Jörg, von Brittnau, in Bern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Valkanover, Stefan Dr., von Reiden, in Bern, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber, Rolf Marius, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gysi, Heidi Erika, von Unterseen, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tschudi, Stephan Johannes, von Glarus, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinlin, Walter, von Rebstein, in Bern, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Abegglen, Bernhard, von Iseltwald, in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretär der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aellen, Kurt, von Saanen, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kusano, Katharina Rebekka, genannt Katja, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruh, Dominik, von Buch (SH), in Bern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.