Reports for Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Rothenburg.
- The management of the organization Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 08.11.2023.
- In the commercial register the organization Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg is registered under the UID CHE-104.031.595.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Marko Kanngiesser,
Markus Alois Aregger,
Florian Hailer,
Andrea Sigrist-Fischer
newest authorized signatories
Marko Kanngiesser,
Markus Alois Aregger,
Florian Hailer,
Andrea Sigrist-Fischer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.01.1962
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Rothenburg
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.5.008.004-8
UID/VAT
CHE-104.031.595
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verschaffung und Erhaltung von gesunden und preisgünstigen Wohnungen für ihre Mitglieder in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe und Mitverantwortung; Förderung des Zusammenlebens im Sinne gesamtgesellschaftlicher Verantwortung und gegenseitiger Solidarität.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Revisions AG | Sursee | 18.03.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005879495, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg, in Rothenburg, CHE-104.031.595, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2022, Publ. 1005511104).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jud, Roland, von Seeberg, in Rothenburg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kanngiesser, Marko, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rothenburg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005511104, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg, in Rothenburg, CHE-104.031.595, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2021, Publ. 1005361238).
Domizil neu:
Mauritiusring 1, 6023 Rothenburg.
Publication number: HR02-1005361238, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Mauritius Rothenburg, in Rothenburg, CHE-104.031.595, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2018, Publ. 1004521007).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lütolf, Philipp, von Luzern, in Rothenburg, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aregger, Markus, von Luzern und Hohenrain, in Rain, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hailer, Florian, von Luzern, in Rothenburg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sigrist-Fischer, Andrea, von Rothenburg und Eschenbach (LU), in Rothenburg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Eschenbach (LU), Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.