Address
c/o Geiger Treuhand AG
Feldlistrasse 10c
9413 Oberegg
Reports for Wohnbau AG, Oberegg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohnbau AG, Oberegg
- Wohnbau AG, Oberegg has its legal headquarters in Oberegg and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Wohnbau AG, Oberegg consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 17.09.1969.
- On the 22.03.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Wohnbau AG, Oberegg is registered under the UID CHE-102.773.562.
- There are 21 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: A1 Holding AG, Alps Business Partners AG, AR Projekt GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
Johann Niklaus Breu,
Dr. Andres Ulrich Büsser,
Hans Sonderegger,
Walter Bischofberger-Meier
newest authorized signatories
Johann Niklaus Breu,
Dr. Andres Ulrich Büsser,
Walter Bischofberger-Meier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.09.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberegg
Commercial Registry Office
AI
Commercial register number
CH-310.3.000.322-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.773.562
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
An- und Verkauf von Grundstücken sowie Erstellung und Verwaltung von Wohnbauten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte abschliessen, die direkt oder indirekt mit diesem Hauptzweck zusammenhängen, und sich an anderen Gesellschaften beteiligen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohnbau AG, Oberegg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005992534, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
Wohnbau AG, Oberegg, in Oberegg, CHE-102.773.562, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2019, Publ. 1004669034).
Domizil neu:
c/o Geiger Treuhand AG, Feldlistrasse 10c, 9413 Oberegg.
Publication number: HR02-1004669034, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
Wohnbau AG, Oberegg, in Oberegg, CHE-102.773.562, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 04.04.2012, S.0, Publ. 6626388).
Domizil neu:
c/o Geiger Treuhand AG, Ebenaustrasse 8, 9413 Oberegg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Locher, Dr. Kurt, von Oberegg, in Oberegg, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mainberger, Anton, von Richterswil, in Oberegg, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Büsser, Andres Ulrich, von Zürich, in St. Gallen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Breu, Johann Niklaus Ignaz, genannt Hans, von Oberegg, in Appenzell Steinegg (Rüte), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6626388, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
Wohnbau AG, Oberegg, in Oberegg, CH-310.3.000.322-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 30.07.2010, S. 3, Publ. 5751824).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bischofberger, Dr. René, von Oberegg, in Rorschach, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sonderegger, Hans, von Oberegg, in Oberegg, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Schaffhausen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.