Reports for Wohlfender AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohlfender AG
- Wohlfender AG in Sulgen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Wohlfender AG is active.
- The company was founded on 10.12.1934.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 30.06.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.380.254.
- 11er Nahrungsmittel GmbH, Achieva Group (Switzerland) GmbH, Breitenmoser Real Estate AG are registered at the same address.
Management (3)
newest board members
Manuel Peter Eberle,
Katharina Sabina Caruso,
Daniel Wohlfender
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Peter Eberle,
Katharina Sabina Caruso,
Daniel Wohlfender
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.12.1934
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sulgen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.371-6
UID/VAT
CHE-103.380.254
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Beratungs- und Management-Dienstleistungen im Holzsektor. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, überbauen und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BRAG AG | Kradolf-Schönenberg | <2004 | 13.05.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohlfender AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005783367, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfender AG, in Sulgen, CHE-103.380.254, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2022, Publ. 1005382559).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Andermatt, Benno, von Baar, in Schönenberg an der Thur (Kradolf-Schönenberg), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wohlfender, Daniel, von Sulgen, in Mettendorf TG (Hüttlingen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Sulgen];
Eberle, Manuel, von Häggenschwil, in Zuckenriet (Niederhelfenschwil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Caruso, Katharina Sabina, von Basel, in Mettendorf TG (Hüttlingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Kefikon TG (Gachnang)].
Publication number: HR02-1005382559, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfender AG, in Sulgen, CHE-103.380.254, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2017, Publ. 3747559).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wohlfender, Doris, von Appenzell und Sulgen, in Sulgen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wohlfender, Daniel, von Sulgen, in Sulgen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Andermatt, Benno [keine Mutation, Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung], von Baar, in Schönenberg an der Thur (Kradolf-Schönenberg), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Andermatt, Benno, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Caruso, Katharina Sabina, von Basel, in Kefikon TG (Gachnang), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3747559, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfender AG, in Sulgen, CHE-103.380.254, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2009, Publ. 5019080).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wohlfender, Max, von Sulgen, in Sulgen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wohlfender, Daniel, von Sulgen, in Sulgen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wohlfender, Doris, von Appenzell und Sulgen, in Sulgen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Schürpf-Wohlfender, Doris, in Zuben (Langrickenbach)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.