Reports for Willi Hasler AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Willi Hasler AG
- Willi Hasler AG from Hellikon operates in the sector «Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work» and is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 11.06.2010. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-106.434.923.
- Next to the company Willi Hasler AG there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Fricktal Treuhand Peter Frick, RELSAH Immobilien AG, Samuel Hasler Haustechnik GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hellikon
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.010.365-6
UID/VAT
CHE-106.434.923
Sector
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Holzbau- und Bedachungsunternehmens; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen oder mit ihnen fusionieren sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reto Müller & Partner Treuhand AG | Küttigen | <2004 | 10.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hasler Willi AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Willi Hasler AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5671174, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Willi Hasler AG, in Hellikon, CH-400.3.010.365-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.1995, S. 5523).
Statutenänderung:
26.02.2010.
Domizil neu:
Oberdorf 15, 4316 Hellikon, [behördliche Umadressierung].
Zweck neu:
Betrieb eines Holzbau- und Bedachungsunternehmens;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen oder mit ihnen fusionieren sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage bei der Gründung ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage: Aktiven und Passiven gemäss Bilanz per 31.12.1991 des Ge-schäftes von Willi Hasler in Hellikon, zum Preise von CHF 283'716.39, wovon CHF 100'000.-- als Sacheinlage angerechnet werden.].Mitteilungen neu: Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft sind den im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionären schriftlich oder mit elektronischer Post zuzustellen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.02.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision..
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reto Müller & Partner Treuhand AG, in Eiken, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Willi Hasler AG, in Hellikon, Holzbau und Bedachungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr.49 vom 12.3.1992 S.1136).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reto Müller & Partner Treuhand AG, in Eiken, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Willi Hasler AG, in Hellikon , Chalet 361, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Datum der Statuten:
8.2.1992.
Zweck:
Holzbau und Bedachungen.
Grundkapital:
Fr.100000, voll liberiert, 100 Namenaktien zu Fr.1000.
Sacheinlage:
Aktiven von Fr.347992.20 und Passiven von Fr.64275.90 des von Willi Hasler in Hellikon betriebenen, nicht eingetragenen Geschäftes, gemäss Bilanz vom 31.12.1991, zum Preise von Fr.283716.30, wovon Fr.100000 an das Grundkapital angerechnet werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Verwaltungsrat:
1 oder mehrere Mitglieder.
Ihm gehören an:
Hasler Willi, Präsident, und Hasler Liselotte, beide von und in Hellikon, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.