Address
c/o Chris Haubenwallner
Florapark 2
9500 Wil SG
Reports for Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung
- Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung in Wil SG is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung is active.
- The organization was founded on 10.03.1984.
- On the 01.12.2023 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-100.654.136.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Julia Patricia Steinmann,
Désirée Barbara Bosshard,
Yannik Martin Ruckstuhl,
Ursina Monika Bosshard,
Chris Felix Haubenwallner
newest authorized signatories
Désirée Barbara Bosshard,
Ursina Monika Bosshard,
Chris Felix Haubenwallner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.03.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Wil (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.023.342-1
UID/VAT
CHE-100.654.136
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterstützung und Förderung der Wiler Jugendarbeit.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MOSER TREUHAND AG | Wil (SG) | 15.11.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Credor AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Zürich | 27.05.2015 | 14.11.2018 | |
Credor AG Treuhand | Wil (SG) | 17.02.2009 | 26.05.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005898948, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung, in Wil (SG), CHE-100.654.136, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 07.11.2022, Publ. 1005598439).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flammer, Angelika, von Zuzwil SG, in Bronschhofen (Wil SG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinmann, Julia Patricia, von Seedorf (BE), in Bronschhofen (Wil (SG)), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005598439, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung, in Wil (SG), CHE-100.654.136, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2021, Publ. 1005361733).
Domizil neu:
c/o Chris Haubenwallner, Florapark 2, 9500 Wil SG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ruckstuhl, Beat, von Braunau, in Rossrüti (Wil (SG)), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nägeli, Pascal, von Gais, in Wil SG, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshard, Désirée Barbara, von Wil (SG), in Wil SG, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruckstuhl, Yannik Martin, von Braunau, in Rossrüti (Wil (SG)), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005361733, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wiler Pfarreijugend-Stiftung, in Wil (SG), CHE-100.654.136, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 30.12.2019, Publ. 1004795420).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Ostschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (CHE-113.698.580), in St. Gallen.
Organisation neu:
[gestrichen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schwager, Bettina, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshard, Ursina Monika, von Wil (SG), in Wil SG, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.