Reports for Westhalle
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Westhalle
- Westhalle from Thun operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation» and is active.
- The management of the organization Westhalle, which was founded on the 20.02.2019, consists of 6 persons.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 28.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization's UID is CHE-221.836.318.
- Companies with the same address as Westhalle: Petric MP6, SAI INDIAN RESTAURANT INH. KUMAR, Südkurve Thun GmbH.
Management (6)
newest members of the committee
Mischa Erni,
Kathrin Misho,
Simon Peter Liebi,
Stefan Jakob,
Matthias Tschanz
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.2019
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.6.076.722-2
UID/VAT
CHE-221.836.318
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein arbeitet auf gemeinnütziger Basis und bezweckt die Förderung von sozialen, kulturellen und gesellschaftsfördernden Initiativen. Dies geschieht durch eigene Initiative und Angebote und durch das Vermieten und zur Verfügung stellen von Räumlichkeiten und Infrastruktur, primär für andere Vereine und soziale Institutionen. Dadurch soll ein Ort der Begegnung und Synergien entstehen und die gegenseitige Ergänzung und Vernetzung von solchen Angeboten soll gefördert werden. Der Verein kann die zur Erfüllung des Vereinszwecks nötigen Gebäude und Räumlichkeiten erwerben oder mieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HST Treuhand AG | Thierachern | 25.02.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Westhalle
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006041187, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Westhalle, in Thun, CHE-221.836.318, Verein (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 13.06.2022, Publ. 1005493471).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kuhn, Timo, von Oberkulm, in Uetendorf, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erni, Mischa, von Oetwil am See, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Misho, Kathrin, von Gondiswil, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Thun];
Liebi, Simon, von Seftigen, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Wichtrach].
Publication number: HR02-1005493471, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Westhalle, in Thun, CHE-221.836.318, Verein (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 28.06.2021, Publ. 1005229932).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gerber, Johannes, von Oberlangenegg, in Thun, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Misho, Kathrin, von Gondiswil, in Thun, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005229932, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Westhalle, in Thun, CHE-221.836.318, Verein (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 03.09.2020, Publ. 1004970565).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Graf, Walter, von Heiligenschwendi, in Goldiwil (Thun), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Liebi, Simon, von Seftigen, in Wichtrach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.