Reports for WESCO AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WESCO AG
- WESCO AG has its legal headquarters in Wettingen and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading with machines».
- The management of the company WESCO AG, which was founded on the 21.07.1960, consists of 11 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 07.02.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-109.028.413.
- In the IPI there are 15 trademarks or applications registered by the company WESCO AG.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: 'WELMA' Personalfürsorgestiftung, MLT Holding AG, MLT Moderne Licht-Technik AG.
Management (11)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Oliver Patrick Zimmermann,
Michel Tschanz,
Ralph Schmiedecke,
Emanuel Ritzmann,
Marcus Baumann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.07.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wettingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.914.080-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.028.413
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung und Vertrieb von Geräten und Anlagen zur Luftreinigung und allgemein der Lufttechnik und des Umweltschutzes, Metallbau, Verwaltung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften, sowie Verwertung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Patenten, Lizenzen und anderen immateriellen Rechten; die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Brugg | 17.02.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Intertest Revisions- und Wirtschaftsberatungs AG in Liquidation | Brugg | <2004 | 16.02.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
ALTO | 19.07.2024 | active | 09737/2024 |
PIANA | 08.05.2020 | active | 16303/2019 |
Newest SOGC notifications: WESCO AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005955142, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WESCO AG, in Wettingen, CHE-109.028.413, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2024, Publ. 1005940402).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgler, Peter, von Wettingen, in Wettingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Moser, Christoph, von Besenbüren, in Hägglingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zimmermann, Oliver Patrick, von Ennetbürgen, in Wettingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005940402, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WESCO AG, in Wettingen, CHE-109.028.413, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2023, Publ. 1005853617). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2024].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ritzmann, Emanuel, von Wilchingen, in Baden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Turgi].
Publication number: HR02-1005853617, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WESCO AG, in Wettingen, CHE-109.028.413, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 23.05.2022, Publ. 1005480048).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Florian, von Winterthur, in Steinhausen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Chkolnix, Daniel, von Peseux, in Ollon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Minger, Antony, von Fraubrunnen, in Oetwil an der Limmat, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Tiefenauer, Kurt Josef, von Kaltbrunn, in Baden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst, Beat, von Würenlos, in Wettingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ritzmann, Emanuel, von Wilchingen, in Turgi, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schmiedecke, Ralph, von Zürich, in Staufen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Tschanz, Michel, von Sigriswil, in Orbe, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.