Reports for WESCA Holdings AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WESCA Holdings AG
- WESCA Holdings AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Cham. WESCA Holdings AG belongs to the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active.
- The management of the company WESCA Holdings AG consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 31.01.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZG is CHE-440.877.885.
- 8888 Investments GmbH, ABISCAL AG, AscoReal AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.12.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.039.350-6
UID/VAT
CHE-440.877.885
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie Durchführung von Finanzgeschäften aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- WESCA Holdings SA
- WESCA Holdings Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: WESCA Holdings AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005665784, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
WESCA Holdings AG, in Cham, CHE-440.877.885, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 02.06.2021, Publ. 1005202747).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willi-Rossi, Katia, von Brusino Arsizio, in Origlio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherer, Paul, von Zürich und Flühli, in Hünenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005202747, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
WESCA Holdings AG, in Cham, CHE-440.877.885, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 29.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1905999).
Aktien neu:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00]. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.
Publication number: 1905999, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
WESCA Holdings AG (WESCA Holdings SA) (WESCA Holdings Ltd), in Cham, CHE-440.877.885, Riedstrasse 7, 6330 Cham, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
27.11.2014.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie Durchführung von Finanzgeschäften aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre, deren Namen und Adressen bekannt sind, erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax, an die übrigen durch die Bekanntgabe im SHAB. Mit Erklärung vom 10.12.2014 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Menell, Brian M., britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Woodstock (UK), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Willi-Rossi, Katia, von Brusino Arsizio, in Origlio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.