Address
c/o Kern Treuhandpartner AG
Schützenwiese 8
9451 Kriessern
Reports for Werner Fischer Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Werner Fischer Immobilien AG
- Werner Fischer Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Kriessern and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 12.07.2018. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Werner Fischer Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.895.487.
- The address is identical with 29 other active companies. These include: ASSEPRO Brokerage AG, Der Profi Personalmanagement AG, Dietsche MontageProfis AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Felizitas Agnes Fischer Gallay,
Gabriela Fischer,
Salvator Fischer
newest authorized signatories
Felizitas Agnes Fischer Gallay,
Gabriela Fischer,
Salvator Fischer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.08.1972
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberriet (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.003.725-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.895.487
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
An- und Verkauf sowie Verwaltung von Grundstücken aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich auch an Unternehmen, die gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen und solche erwerben sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kern Treuhandpartner AG | Oberriet (SG) | <2004 | 14.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Werner Fischer Immobilien-, Handels- und Verwaltungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Werner Fischer Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4354487, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Werner Fischer Immobilien AG, in Oberriet SG, CHE-101.895.487, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 01.06.2016, Publ. 2863581).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer, Christoph, von Rüti ZH, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fischer, Dr. Werner, von Rüti ZH, in Uitikon Waldegg (Uitikon), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischer Gallay, Felizitas Agnes, von Rüti ZH, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2863581, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Werner Fischer Immobilien AG, in Oberriet SG, CHE-101.895.487, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 82 vom 28.04.2016, Publ. 2806467).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer-Lauber, Elisabeth, von Rüti ZH, in Sirnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 2806467, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Werner Fischer Immobilien AG, in Rheineck, CHE-101.895.487, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 29.05.2012, Publ. 6693956).
Statutenänderung:
31.03.2016.
Sitz neu:
Oberriet SG.
Domizil neu:
c/o Kern Treuhandpartner AG, Schützenwiese 8, 9451 Kriessern.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.