Branches (1)
Reports for Weplan AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Weplan AG
- Weplan AG is active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Egerkingen.
- The management of the company Weplan AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 31.10.2011.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.01.2019.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-343.011.798.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: AWF Aktiengesellschaft für Wirtschaftsförderung, Fährhof AG, Zweigniederlassung Egerkingen, VDM AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Patrik von Däniken,
Paul von Däniken,
Sandra Eustache-von Däniken
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Patrik von Däniken,
Paul von Däniken,
Sandra Eustache-von Däniken
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.10.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Egerkingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.010.473-7
UID/VAT
CHE-343.011.798
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung und Erstellung von Wohn- und Geschäftsbauten auf eigene und fremde Rechnung sowie Verwaltung, Vermietung, Verpachtung und Vermittlung von Immobilien aller Art. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche mit dem Zweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen und diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
JAM Group AG | Egerkingen | 03.11.2011 | 27.10.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Weplan AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004542919, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Weplan AG, in Egerkingen, CHE-343.011.798, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 17.04.2015, Publ. 2104117).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Däniken, Patrik, von Erlinsbach (SO), in Egerkingen, Geschäftsführer, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: in Boningen].
Publication number: 2104117, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Weplan AG, in Egerkingen, CHE-343.011.798, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 08.04.2015, Publ. 2083915).
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Aarau (CHE-478.089.436).
Publication number: 2083915, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Weplan AG, in Egerkingen, CHE-343.011.798, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 28.10.2013, Publ. 1149495).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Manfred, von Schmiedrued, in Olten, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Däniken, Patrik, von Erlinsbach SO, in Boningen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.