Address
Route de la Roserette 11
1063 Peyres-Possens
Reports for Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl
- Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl from Peyres-Possens operates in the sector «Research and development» and is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 10.11.2016.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 23.06.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl is the following: CHE-488.615.674.
- 2 trademarks or applications for trademarks are currently registered in the IPI database.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.11.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Montanaire
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.170.434-3
UID/VAT
CHE-488.615.674
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la recherche et le développement, la fabrication, la distribution, la commercialisation de tous appareils et de produits de bien-être pour humains et animaux (chevaux et chiens en particulier), notamment dans le domaine de la thermorégulation et des soins en cryothérapie, destinées par exemple aux sportifs ou à l'industrie ou les centres de soins, hôpitaux, cliniques (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
19.01.2022 | active | 17626/2021 | |
Nous ne sommes pas un médicament, nous ne sommes pas un anti-inflammatoire, nous sommes WILLIFE | 28.12.2020 | active | 10480/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004918090, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl, à Montanaire, CHE-488.615.674 (FOSC du 15.11.2016, p. 0/3162995). Roux Katia, qui n'est plus associée-gérante et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 120 parts de CHF 100 à l'associée-gérante Bechaalany Patricia, maintenant à Montanaire, désormais titulaire de 240 parts de CHF 100, laquelle signe maintenant individuellement.
Publication number: 3162995, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Waves Impulse Life (WIL) Sàrl, à Montanaire, route de la Roserette 11, 1063 Peyres-Possens, CHE-488.615.674. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
4 novembre 2016.
But:
la société a pour but la recherche et le développement, la fabrication, la distribution, la commercialisation de tous appareils et de produits de bien-être pour humains et animaux (chevaux et chiens en particulier), notamment dans le domaine de la thermorégulation et des soins en cryothérapie, destinées par exemple aux sportifs ou à l'industrie ou les centres de soins, hôpitaux, cliniques (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 24'000. Apport en nature et reprise de biens selon convention du 4 novembre 2016: un appareil de mesure et d'analyse de données physiques et de l'état énergétique du corps, pour le prix de CHF 10'000;
en contrepartie, il est remis 95 parts sociales de CHF 100, le solde de CHF 500 constituant une créance de l'apporteur contre la société.
Associées-gérantes avec signature collective à deux:
Roux Katia, de Genève, à Gimel, présidente, et Bechaalany Patricia, de Lausanne, à Pully, chacune avec 120 parts de CHF 100.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par courrier écrit (pli simple) ou par courrier électronique (e-mail). Selon déclaration du 4 novembre 2016, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.